This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2022 at 21:31:08 (UTC).

DELVIN LAMAR SWINTON VS MIRNA LETICIA ALDANA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 DELVIN LAMAR SWINTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MIRNA LETICIA ALDANA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2623

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWINTON DELVIN LAMAR

Defendants

ALDANA MIRNA LETICIA

LOPEZ JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOMINGO MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/8/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/12/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2023
  • Hearing06/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 205 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 205

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr. in Department 205 Beverly Hills Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Delvin Lamar Swinton (Plaintiff); As to: Mirna Leticia Aldana (Defendant); Juan Lopez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Delvin Lamar Swinton (Plaintiff); As to: Mirna Leticia Aldana (Defendant); Juan Lopez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Delvin Lamar Swinton (Plaintiff); As to: Mirna Leticia Aldana (Defendant); Juan Lopez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less