This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2019 at 16:44:16 (UTC).

DELORES PERRYMAN VS COMPTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 DELORES PERRYMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COMPTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5856

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERRYMAN DELORES

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GREATER ZION CHURCH

COMPTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

EL CAMINO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

QUINONES RIKO

HIGH GRAVITY PRODUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELL TIMOTHY P.

Defendant Attorneys

WALSH DENNIS JOHN

SINATRA SUZANA IRENA

BROCKMAN ROBERT W.

Cross Defendant Attorney

PRASAD SUSAN R

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

6/20/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer

6/20/2019: Answer

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/4/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/26/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW WALLIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES

7/30/2018: DECLARATION OF MATTHEW WALLIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES

7/30/2018: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES

ORDE RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

8/28/2018: ORDE RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order

8/28/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF COURTS RULING REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES

8/30/2018: NOTICE OF COURTS RULING REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES

Motion to Compel

10/9/2018: Motion to Compel

Declaration

10/9/2018: Declaration

Minute Order

10/23/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

10/23/2018: Ex Parte Application

Declaration

10/23/2018: Declaration

Notice of Ruling

11/1/2018: Notice of Ruling

Opposition

11/19/2018: Opposition

Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

11/29/2018: Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

Minute Order

12/4/2018: Minute Order

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Cross-Complaint); Filed by Riko Quinones (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Riko Quinones (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GREATER ZION CHURCH (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by GREATER ZION CHURCH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by GREATER ZION CHURCH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketAnswer (ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT LITTLE ZION BAPTIST CHURCH DBA GREATER ZION CHURCH FAMILY (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS GREATER ZION CHURCH)TO CROSS-COMPLAINT? OF COMPTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT AND EL CAMINO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRIC); Filed by GREATER ZION CHURCH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by GREATER ZION CHURCH (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GREATER ZION CHURCH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by DELORES PERRYMAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by COMPTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT (Defendant); EL CAMINO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Filed by COMPTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT (Defendant); EL CAMINO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by COMPTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT (Defendant); EL CAMINO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by DELORES PERRYMAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DELORES PERRYMAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5856    Hearing Date: October 30, 2019    Dept: 4A

The Court continues the hearing on Defendants Compton Community College District’s and El Camino Community College District’s motion for determination of good faith settlement to December 3, 2019 at 1:30 p.m., for failure to comply with notice requirements under Code of Civil Procedure section 1005. Defendants are ordered to give notice of this ruling.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where EL CAMINO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT A MUNICIPAL ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL TIMOTHY PAUL