This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2020 at 13:41:04 (UTC).

DELMORGAN GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL. VS FIORE MANAGEMENT, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 DELMORGAN GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FIORE MANAGEMENT, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5872

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DELMORGAN GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GLOBALIST CAPITAL LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

FIORE MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SMITH GREG

SMITH GREGORY M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HUYNH ELIZABETH L.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/26/2020: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NEIL MORGANBESSER IN SUPPORT

4/13/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NEIL MORGANBESSER IN SUPPORT

Notice of Motion

4/13/2020: Notice of Motion

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

4/13/2020: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY M. SMITH IN SUPPORT

4/13/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY M. SMITH IN SUPPORT

Request for Judicial Notice

4/13/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/27/2020

4/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/27/2020

Cross-Complaint

3/10/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

3/10/2020: Answer

Case Management Statement

3/12/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/13/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

2/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

2/20/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/20/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

2/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by DelMorgan Group, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Globalist Capital, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:12 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/27/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference); Filed by DelMorgan Group, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Globalist Capital, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Neil Morganbesser in Support); Filed by DelMorgan Group, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Cross-Defendant); Globalist Capital, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by DelMorgan Group, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Cross-Defendant); Globalist Capital, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by DelMorgan Group, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Cross-Defendant); Globalist Capital, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by DelMorgan Group, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Cross-Defendant); Globalist Capital, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by DelMorgan Group, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Globalist Capital, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by DelMorgan Group, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Globalist Capital, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DelMorgan Group, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Globalist Capital, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DelMorgan Group, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Globalist Capital, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DelMorgan Group, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Globalist Capital, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DelMorgan Group, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Globalist Capital, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DelMorgan Group, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Globalist Capital, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DELMORGAN GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH GREGORY M. ESQ.