This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/29/2021 at 13:24:39 (UTC).

DELMI CISNEROS, , AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST FOR VICTOR CISNEROS VS JUVINTINO MORALES

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 DELMI CISNEROS, , AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST FOR VICTOR CISNEROS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUVINTINO MORALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6303

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CISNEROS DELMI AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST FOR VICTOR CISNEROS

Defendant

MORALES JUVINTINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALPERN DERRYL

Defendant Attorney

OAKES CONNOR

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/30/2021: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DELMI CISNEROS

4/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DELMI CISNEROS

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

5/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

5/18/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/1/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2024
  • Hearing04/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • Hearing10/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • Hearing10/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Juvintino Morales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Juvintino Morales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Delmi Cisneros, , an individual and as successor in interest for Victor Cisneros (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Delmi Cisneros); Filed by Delmi Cisneros, , an individual and as successor in interest for Victor Cisneros (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Delmi Cisneros, , an individual and as successor in interest for Victor Cisneros (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Delmi Cisneros, , an individual and as successor in interest for Victor Cisneros (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Delmi Cisneros, , an individual and as successor in interest for Victor Cisneros (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALPERN DERRYL S.