This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2020 at 02:16:26 (UTC).

DELIA VENEGAS VS LOUIS RIOS ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2018 DELIA VENEGAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOUIS RIOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5087

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VENEGAS DELIA

Defendants and Respondents

RIOS LOUIS

DOES 1 TO 25

COMLOCK SECURITY GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LOPEZ OCTAVIO P. ESQ.

LOPEZ OCTAVIO PEDRO

Defendant Attorney

WANG CHRISTINA EMILY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

8/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER RE MINUTE ORDER DATED 4/16/20;) OF 05/04/2020

5/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER RE MINUTE ORDER DATED 4/16/20;) OF 05/04/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER RE MINUTE ORDER DATED 4/16/20;)

5/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER RE MINUTE ORDER DATED 4/16/20;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...)

4/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...) OF 04/16/2020

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...) OF 04/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

3/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/11/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

3/4/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Order - ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

3/6/2020: Order - ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

3/6/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ...)

3/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ...)

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

2/27/2020: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

2/27/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Demand for Jury Trial

8/5/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/5/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/5/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/6/2019: Proof of Personal Service

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE (AUTO)

5/4/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE (AUTO)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • Hearing05/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Hearing02/23/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Counsel in Support of Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery and [Proposed] Order) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Counsel in Support of Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery and [Proposed] Order) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Responses to Demand for Identification and Inspection of Documents; Request for Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Counsel in Support of Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery and [Proposed] Order) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference (to be held with Motions to Compel) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Hearing on Motio...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docketat 1:23 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Louis Rios (Defendant); Comlock Security Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Louis Rios (Defendant); Comlock Security Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Louis Rios (Defendant); Comlock Security Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Louis Rios (Defendant); Comlock Security Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Delia Venegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Delia Venegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE (AUTO)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC705087    Hearing Date: August 12, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

DELIA VENEGAS,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

LOUIS RIOS, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC705087

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS’ UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO COMPEL; DENYING PLAINTIFF’S ATTORNEY’S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 31

10:00 a.m.

August 12, 2020

  1. Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Plaintiff’s attorney seeks to be relieved as counsel, contending there has been a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. CRC 3.1362(d) makes clear that a motion to be relieved as counsel must be served on a client at an address that has been confirmed within the past thirty days; if Counsel cannot make such a showing, then Counsel must establish sufficient efforts to confirm the address within thirty days. Counsel herein declares he confirmed Plaintiff’s address in November of 2019, but he filed his moving papers in February of 2020. This is not sufficient to comply with the Rules of Court. The motion is therefore denied without prejudice.

  2. Motions to Compel

    Defendants propounded form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and RPDs on Plaintiff on 7/10/19. To date, despite multiple extensions of time to respond, Plaintiff has not served responses. Defendants therefore seek an order compelling Plaintiff to respond, without objections, to the outstanding discovery and to pay sanctions.

    Defendants’ motions are granted. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses to form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and RPDs, without objections, within ten days. CCP §§2030.290(a),(b), 2031.300(a),(b).

    Sanctions are mandatory. §§2030.290(c), 2031.300(c). Defendants seek sanctions in varying amounts in connection with each motion. Defense Counsel bills at the rate of $121/hour. The Court awards one hour to prepare each form discovery motion. The Court awards the requested two hours to appear at the hearing, but only awards the time once. The Court therefore awards a total of five hours of attorney time at the rate of $121/hour, or $605 in attorneys’ fees. The Court also awards three filing fees of $60 each, or $180 in costs.

    Sanctions are sought and imposed against Plaintiff only and not against her attorney of record; she is ordered to pay sanctions to Defendants, by and through counsel of record, in the total amount of $785, within twenty days.

    Defendants are ordered to give notice.

    Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

Dated this 12th day of August, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court