This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2022 at 15:44:55 (UTC).

DELFINA SOLIS, AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR MARIO QUINTANILLA VS FACEY MEDICAL GROUP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 DELFINA SOLIS, AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR MARIO QUINTANILLA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against FACEY MEDICAL GROUP,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0580

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLIS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR MARIO QUINTANILLA DELFINA

Defendants

CORDERO M.D. FAUSTO

FACEY MEDICAL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUNCH BRUCE M

Defendant Attorney

LAW YUK K.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/29/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/26/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Answer

9/14/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/14/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service - No Service

10/3/2022: Proof of Service - No Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • Hearing03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F51 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F51 - Hon. Randy Rhodeseffective 10/10/2022; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: DELFINA SOLIS, AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR MARIO QUINTANILLA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- 03/03/2023 Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department F49 to Department F51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: FACEY MEDICAL GROUP (Defendant); FAUSTO CORDERO, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: FACEY MEDICAL GROUP (Defendant); FAUSTO CORDERO, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: DELFINA SOLIS, AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR MARIO QUINTANILLA (Plaintiff); As to: FAUSTO CORDERO, M.D. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/23/2022; Service Cost: 113.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DELFINA SOLIS, AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR MARIO QUINTANILLA (Plaintiff); As to: FACEY MEDICAL GROUP (Defendant); Service Date: 08/15/2022; Service Cost: 103.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Deemed PI Complicated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen P. Pfahler in Department F49 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketAddress for Bruce M Bunch (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DELFINA SOLIS, AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR MARIO QUINTANILLA (Plaintiff); As to: FACEY MEDICAL GROUP (Defendant); FAUSTO CORDERO, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DELFINA SOLIS, AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR MARIO QUINTANILLA (Plaintiff); As to: FACEY MEDICAL GROUP (Defendant); FAUSTO CORDERO, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DELFINA SOLIS, AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR MARIO QUINTANILLA (Plaintiff); As to: FACEY MEDICAL GROUP (Defendant); FAUSTO CORDERO, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed PI Complicated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Facey Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUNCH, BRUCE M