This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/25/2022 at 11:18:12 (UTC).

DELFINA LUNA VS XRG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 DELFINA LUNA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against XRG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8895

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUNA DELFINA

Defendants

XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP

XRG

FM RESTAURANTS EL TORITO OPCO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALADY MICHELLE

Defendant Attorney

GUIBOA RYAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/4/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/18/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/29/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS CERTAIN CLAIMS FROM PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

9/15/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS CERTAIN CLAIMS FROM PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Answer

9/3/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • Hearing03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • Hearing09/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Hearing09/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by FM Restaurants El Torito OPCO, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (STIPULATION TO DISMISS CERTAIN CLAIMS FROM PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT); Filed by FM Restaurants El Torito OPCO, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FM Restaurants El Torito OPCO, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Delfina Luna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Delfina Luna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Delfina Luna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Delfina Luna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Delfina Luna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FM Restaurants El Torito Opco, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BALADY MICHELLE