This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 00:25:40 (UTC).

DEL ROSARIO, THERESA PARAS VS DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO

Case Summary

On 03/05/2018 DEL ROSARIO, THERESA PARAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0332

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DEL ROSARIO THERESA

DEL ROSARIO THERESA PARAS

Respondent

DEL ROSARIO EDUARDO RAZO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (amended ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Default (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Petition - Amended (1st) (Petitioner: Name Changes ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property (amended ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2018
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Declaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Notice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.