This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2023 at 03:18:13 (UTC).

DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C. VS WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L L C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1314

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY L.L.C.

Defendant

WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PELLETIER STEPHEN T

Defendant Attorney

RETZ KIRK J

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/22/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

11/28/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Proof of Personal Service

11/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

1/4/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/4/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Judicial Notice

1/4/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • Hearing06/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute; Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • Hearing06/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • Hearing04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by: WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C. (Plaintiff); As to: WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY (Defendant); Service Date: 11/30/2022; Service Cost: 144.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute; Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 06/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C. (Plaintiff); As to: WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C. (Plaintiff); As to: WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C. (Plaintiff); As to: WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less