This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 16:49:58 (UTC).

DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C. VS PARADISE DIZAIN, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L L C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PARADISE DIZAIN, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1024

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY L.L.C.

Defendants

NAHUM EDEN

PARADISE DIZAIN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERZOG JONATHON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/24/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

10/28/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE SANCTIONS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/20/2023: Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE SANCTIONS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/25/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/25/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Del Amo Fashion Center Operating Company, L.L.C. (Plaintiff); As to: Paradise Dizain, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/04/2023; Service Cost: 258.85; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Del Amo Fashion Center Operating Company, L.L.C. (Plaintiff); As to: Eden Nahum (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/04/2023; Service Cost: 70.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of OSC (Name Extension) of Order to Show Cause Hearing re Sanctions and Case Management Conference; Filed by: Del Amo Fashion Center Operating Company, L.L.C. (Plaintiff); As to: Del Amo Fashion Center Operating Company, L.L.C. (Plaintiff); Paradise Dizain, Inc. (Defendant); Eden Nahum (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Del Amo Fashion Center Operating Company, L.L.C. (Plaintiff); As to: Paradise Dizain, Inc. (Defendant); Eden Nahum (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Del Amo Fashion Center Operating Company, L.L.C. (Plaintiff); As to: Paradise Dizain, Inc. (Defendant); Eden Nahum (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Del Amo Fashion Center Operating Company, L.L.C. (Plaintiff); As to: Paradise Dizain, Inc. (Defendant); Eden Nahum (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less