Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 00:19:14 (UTC).

DEGUZMAN, EDWARD VS. DEGUZMAN, CAROLINA

Case Summary

On 02/16/2017 DEGUZMAN, EDWARD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DEGUZMAN, CAROLINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4517

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEGUZMAN EDWARD

Respondent

DEGUZMAN CAROLINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Deguzman, Edward - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-20 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Deguzman, Edward - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-20 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Deguzman, Edward - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-20 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Deguzman, Edward ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 04-06-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Deguzman, Edward ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Deguzman, Edward ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Deguzman, Edward ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 03-02-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Deguzman, Edward ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Statement - Financial (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Deguzman, Edward ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Deguzman, Edward - Denied on 2017-02-16 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Property Declaration (SEPARATE PROPERTY DECL - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Deguzman, Edward ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Notice (CASE ASSIGNEMENT TO F46-JUDGE LOPEZ-GISS - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Deguzman, Edward ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Deguzman, Edward ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Property Declaration (COMMUNITY AND QUASI-COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECL - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Deguzman, Edward ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Deguzman, Edward ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less