This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2022 at 05:12:02 (UTC).

DEGUCHI, TAKASHI TODD VS DEGUCHI, SHELTON DEANNE

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 DEGUCHI, TAKASHI TODD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DEGUCHI, SHELTON DEANNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0028

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEGUCHI TAKASHI TODD

Respondent

DEGUCHI SHELTON DEANNE

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1/10/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

1/10/2022: Notice - Case Assignment

Declaration - UCCJEA

1/10/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/10/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution - Domestic Partners w/ Minor Child

1/10/2022: Petition - Dissolution - Domestic Partners w/ Minor Child

Summons

1/10/2022: Summons

Proof of Service of Summons

2/9/2022: Proof of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution - Domestic Partners w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less