This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/25/2023 at 04:43:46 (UTC).

DEERING, CONSTANCE VS DEERING, STEVEN JAMES

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 DEERING, CONSTANCE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DEERING, STEVEN JAMES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0776

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEERING CONSTANCE

Respondent

DEERING STEVEN JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

WALLERSTEIN MICHAEL AARON

 

Court Documents

Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

3/28/2022: Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

Notice - Entry of Judgment

3/18/2022: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Judgment

3/18/2022: Judgment

Declaration - Default FL170

3/18/2022: Declaration - Default FL170

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

3/18/2022: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

3/18/2022: Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

Proof of Service of Summons

5/19/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

5/19/2021: Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

5/19/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Substitution of Attorney

5/19/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

3/17/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

2/26/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

3/2/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - Separate Property

1/25/2021: Declaration - Separate Property

Summons

1/25/2021: Summons

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

1/25/2021: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

1/25/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/25/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less