This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 04:17:07 (UTC).

DEDRA ASSARIAN VS GOODWILL STORE, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 DEDRA ASSARIAN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against GOODWILL STORE, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1054

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSARIAN DEDRA

Defendants

GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GOODWILL STORE A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCUS GERALD

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/19/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2025
  • Hearing12/19/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2024
  • Hearing02/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2024
  • Hearing02/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/23/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/08/2025 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 12/19/2025 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/08/2025 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department A15 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/14/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Dedra Assarian (Plaintiff); As to: Goodwill Store, a business entity form unknown (Defendant); Goodwill Industries of Southern California, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Dedra Assarian (Plaintiff); As to: Goodwill Store, a business entity form unknown (Defendant); Goodwill Industries of Southern California, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dedra Assarian (Plaintiff); As to: Goodwill Store, a business entity form unknown (Defendant); Goodwill Industries of Southern California, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less