Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2021 at 12:22:25 (UTC).

DECLARATION OF TRUST THE ALICE HERNANDEZ REVOCABLE TRUST

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 DECLARATION OF TRUST THE ALICE HERNANDEZ REVOCABLE TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7186

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRAND ANGELA

Trustee

HERNANDEZ ERNEST

Others

BRAND ETHAN F.

BRAND SEBASTIAN P.

GAMBOA DIANA L.

Not Classified By Court

DECLARATION OF TRUST THE ALICE HERNANDEZ REVOCABLE TRUST

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Trustee, Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE

SAUCEDO GILBERT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/16/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

3/23/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Motion - Disqualify Attorney of Record

3/23/2021: Motion - Disqualify Attorney of Record

Request - Judicial Notice

3/23/2021: Request - Judicial Notice

Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling

1/22/2021: Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name

1/22/2021: Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name

Notice - Hearing

1/11/2021: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

1/11/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Declaration - Addtl Facts Offered by Interested Party Re: Pet. for Inst. Under Probate Code Sec.17200 Filed by Angela Brand

1/14/2021: Declaration - Addtl Facts Offered by Interested Party Re: Pet. for Inst. Under Probate Code Sec.17200 Filed by Angela Brand

Supplement - Clear Probate Notes

1/15/2021: Supplement - Clear Probate Notes

Minute Order

1/20/2021: Minute Order

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial)

8/31/2020: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • Hearing04/30/2021 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Hearing04/30/2021 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Hearing04/30/2021 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department MSC 250A; Mandatory Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Clear Probate Notes ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Addtl Facts Offered by Interested Party Re: Pet. for Inst. Under Probate Code Sec.17200 Filed by Angela Brand ); Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE