Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2021 at 17:47:29 (UTC).

DEBRA VARON VS WALGREEN CO.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 DEBRA VARON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALGREEN CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4624

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARON DEBRA

Defendant

WALGREEN CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLICKMAN STEVEN C.

Defendant Attorney

MIRETSKY MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/6/2021: PI General Order

Demand for Jury Trial

5/20/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/20/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2024
  • Hearing04/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • Hearing10/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • Hearing10/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Walgreen Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Walgreen Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Debra Varon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Debra Varon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Debra Varon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Debra Varon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Walgreen Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLICKMAN STEVEN C. ESQ.