This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 04:57:57 (UTC).

DEBRA SAWYER VS LONGWOOD ENTERPRISES INC

Case Summary

On 01/17/2017 DEBRA SAWYER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LONGWOOD ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7009

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SAWYER DEBRA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

LONGWOOD ENTERPRISES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAVI JOSEPH ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

PAUL HASTINGS LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/4/2017: Minute Order

Order

3/6/2017: Order

Notice

3/15/2017: Notice

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/16/2017: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Deposit

3/16/2017: Civil Deposit

Notice

3/16/2017: Notice

Stipulation

4/11/2017: Stipulation

Stipulation

5/2/2017: Stipulation

Stipulation

6/5/2017: Stipulation

Notice of Settlement

6/7/2017: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order

6/20/2017: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

7/5/2017: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • Case File - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 322; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 322; Initial Status Conference (Initial Status Conference; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Request for Dismissal -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Debra Sawyer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 322; Court Order (Court Order; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Debra Sawyer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • at 2:00 PM in Department 322; Initial Status Conference (Initial Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2017
  • Notice PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT LONG WOOD ENTERPRISES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Notice PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COURT ORDER ON NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION AND NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Debra Sawyer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Order INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 322; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2017
  • Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Debra Sawyer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • PLAINTIFF DEBRA SAWYER'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND RESTITUTION FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE SECOND MEAL PERIODS IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTIONS 226.7, 512, 1198, AND THE WAGE ORDERS ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less