This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2021 at 17:25:22 (UTC).

DEBRA FLETCHER VS U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 DEBRA FLETCHER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against U-HAUL CO OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4761

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLETCHER DEBRA

Defendants

U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA

ZHOU SHANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESFANDI SIMON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

12/20/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2024
  • Hearing12/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • Hearing06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • Hearing05/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Debra Fletcher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Debra Fletcher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Debra Fletcher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant