This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2022 at 02:17:55 (UTC).

DEBRA DAVILA VS IKEA PURCHASING SERVICES (US), INC.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 DEBRA DAVILA filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against IKEA PURCHASING SERVICES US , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9130

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVILA DEBRA

Defendant

IKEA PURCHASING SERVICES US INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELGUM STEPHEN L.

Defendant Attorney

FRISHMAN DAVID M.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

5/28/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/9/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR

1/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATIONS OF ALAN A. CARRICO & KAREN ATKINSON IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY

1/28/2021: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATIONS OF ALAN A. CARRICO & KAREN ATKINSON IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

10/13/2020: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION TO CONT TRIAL AND DISC DATES; DECLARATION OF A. CARRICO IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF S. BELGUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF

10/30/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION TO CONT TRIAL AND DISC DATES; DECLARATION OF A. CARRICO IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF S. BELGUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; DECLARATIONS OF LAURIE N. STAYTON AND ALLYSON M. WELDEN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

10/30/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; DECLARATIONS OF LAURIE N. STAYTON AND ALLYSON M. WELDEN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT IKEA PURCHASING SERVICES' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ...)

11/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT IKEA PURCHASING SERVICES' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFENDANT IKEA PURCHASING SERVICES' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ...) OF 11/02/2020

11/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFENDANT IKEA PURCHASING SERVICES' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ...) OF 11/02/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

11/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Answer

9/27/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/2/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/2/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/6/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/3/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • Hearing07/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Ikea Purchasing Services (US), Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice Of Taking Motion Off Calendar); Filed by Ikea Purchasing Services (US), Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMotion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by Ikea Purchasing Services (US), Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ikea Purchasing Services (US), Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Debra Davila (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Debra Davila (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Debra Davila (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Debra Davila (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Debra Davila (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less