This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2023 at 06:52:27 (UTC).

DEBOURA MASSACHI, ET AL. VS CALIFORNIA CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 DEBOURA MASSACHI, filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CALIFORNIA CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1387

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EMMANUEL PAYAM DAVID

MASSACHI DEBOURA

Defendants

BEVERLY SUNSET SURGICAL ASSOCIATES LLC

CALIFORNIA CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

IN VITROTECH LABS INC.

MOR ELIRAN

ELIRAN MOR MD INCORPORATED

INVITAE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OUNJIAN ROBERT JOHN

Defendant Attorneys

DEVLIN CATHERINE HALL

MARSH BARRY C.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

1/5/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/5/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/3/2023: Case Management Statement

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

12/7/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/2/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/2/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Motion

12/2/2022: Notice of Motion

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

12/2/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BARRY C. MARSH IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/2/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BARRY C. MARSH IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

12/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/7/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/25/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/17/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • Hearing05/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • Hearing05/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • Hearing01/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Deboura Massachi, et al. on 10/25/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Deboura Massachi and Payam David Emmanuel, does xxx

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Rejected; Submitted by: Deboura Massachi (Plaintiff); Payam David Emmanuel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: California Center for Reproductive Health (Defendant); Eliran Mor, M.D. Erroneously Sued As Eliran Mor (Defendant); Eliran Mor, MD, Incorporated (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Deboura Massachi (Plaintiff); Payam David Emmanuel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: In Vitrotech Labs, Inc. (Defendant); Beverly Sunset Surgical Associates, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: California Center for Reproductive Health (Defendant); Eliran Mor, M.D. Erroneously Sued As Eliran Mor (Defendant); Eliran Mor, MD, Incorporated (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 05/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Deboura Massachi (Plaintiff); Payam David Emmanuel (Plaintiff); As to: California Center for Reproductive Health (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/03/2022; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Deboura Massachi (Plaintiff); Payam David Emmanuel (Plaintiff); As to: Eliran Mor (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/07/2022; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Deboura Massachi (Plaintiff); Payam David Emmanuel (Plaintiff); As to: Eliran Mor, MD, Incorporated (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Deboura Massachi (Plaintiff); Payam David Emmanuel (Plaintiff); As to: California Center for Reproductive Health (Defendant); Eliran Mor (Defendant); In Vitrotech Labs, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Deboura Massachi (Plaintiff); Payam David Emmanuel (Plaintiff); As to: California Center for Reproductive Health (Defendant); Eliran Mor (Defendant); In Vitrotech Labs, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Deboura Massachi (Plaintiff); Payam David Emmanuel (Plaintiff); As to: California Center for Reproductive Health (Defendant); Eliran Mor (Defendant); In Vitrotech Labs, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IN VITROTECH LABS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OUNJIAN, ROBERT J