Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2021 at 10:43:21 (UTC).

DEBORAH RAMSEY VS ROYA MAHMOUDI

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 DEBORAH RAMSEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROYA MAHMOUDI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8343

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMSEY DEBORAH

Defendant

MAHMOUDI ROYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARKER MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

ADEM STEPHANIE N.

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

4/15/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/15/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/15/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

1/20/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/18/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2023
  • Hearing12/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Hearing06/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Hearing06/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Roya Mahmoudi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Roya Mahmoudi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Roya Mahmoudi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Parker (Attorney); Deborah Ramsey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Parker (Attorney); Deborah Ramsey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Parker (Attorney); Deborah Ramsey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER MICHAEL