This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 23:32:10 (UTC).

DEBORAH JOHANNES VS GREGORY M SALVATO ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/08/2017 DEBORAH JOHANNES filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against GREGORY M SALVATO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6312

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Petitioner, Plaintiff and Appellant

JOHANNES DEBORAH

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

SALATO GREGORY M.

BOUFADEL JOSEPH

SALVATO LAW OFFICES

SALVATO GREGORY M. DBA SALVATO LAW OFFICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

SPENCER RANDALL ALAN

Defendant Attorneys

FELDMAN KENNETH CHARLES ESQ.

SALVATO GREGORY M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1) LEGAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

2/27/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1) LEGAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

SUMMONS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/27/2018: SUMMONS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Unknown

3/29/2018: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF ADVANCE JURY FEES BY PLAINTIFF

4/3/2018: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF ADVANCE JURY FEES BY PLAINTIFF

Unknown

4/3/2018: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

4/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

Minute Order

4/16/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF DEBORAH JOHANNES' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/17/2018: DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF DEBORAH JOHANNES' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF DEBORAH JOHANNES' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GREGORY M. SALVATO, ESQ.

4/17/2018: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF DEBORAH JOHANNES' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GREGORY M. SALVATO, ESQ.

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED PAPERS

4/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED PAPERS

NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF DEBORAH JOHANNES' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/24/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF DEBORAH JOHANNES' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Unknown

6/5/2018: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

6/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/6/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketNotice Vacating Default or Non-Compliance; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (10-23-18 B293421); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 10:06 AM in Department 19; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re: ORDER ON APPELLANT'S PROPOSED SETTLED STATEMENT) of 04/12/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: ORDER ON APPELLANT'S PROPOSED SETTLED STATEMENT)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketOrder (ON APPELLANT'S PROPOSED SETTLED STATEMENT); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing - Other (On Proposed Settled Statement) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 48; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Case is reassigned) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-12-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL. OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Deborah Johannes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Deborah Johannes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1) LEGAL MALPRACTICE; 2) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; AND 3) BREACH OF CONTRACT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6312    Hearing Date: April 28, 2021    Dept: 76

Plaintiff alleges that Defendants committed legal malpractice in connection with their representation of Plaintiff in bankruptcy proceedings relating to her marital dissolution, which resulted in Plaintiff receiving much less than she was entitled to from her ex-spouse.

Defendant Gregory M. Salvato dba Salvato Law Offices filed a Cross-Complaint for unpaid legal fees.

Plaintiff Deborah Johannes moves to compel arbitration as to the Cross-Complaint and also demurs to the Cross-Complaint.

TENTATIVE RULING