This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2022 at 00:10:31 (UTC).

DEBORAH HALL-GOODBAR VS LYFT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 DEBORAH HALL-GOODBAR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LYFT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5264

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HALL-GOODBAR DEBORAH

Defendants

XU PENG

LYFT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLAIR MATTHEW P

BLAIR MATTHEW P.

LAVINSKI KIRILL

RAMIREZ OSCAR

Defendant Attorneys

WERNER ANDREW

DIZON JECK

MALLA STEFFANIE A.

MOLONEY MEEGAN

MORIARTY DENNIS F.

NEVIS CHRISTOPHER J.

TRIMBLE TRACY A.

WERNER ANDREW S.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

7/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

7/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PAYMENT OF TRANSFER FEES BY PL...)

8/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PAYMENT OF TRANSFER FEES BY PL...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PAYMENT OF TRANSFER FEES BY PL...) OF 08/05/2021

8/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PAYMENT OF TRANSFER FEES BY PL...) OF 08/05/2021

Receipt for Transmitted Record

8/26/2021: Receipt for Transmitted Record

Notice of Outgoing Transfer

8/26/2021: Notice of Outgoing Transfer

Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS

8/27/2021: Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KIRILL LAVINSKI REGARDING TRANSFER FEES

9/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KIRILL LAVINSKI REGARDING TRANSFER FEES

RECEIPT - RETURNED RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD- BUTTE CO- NORTH BUTTE CO. COURTHOUSE - 21CV02238

9/13/2021: RECEIPT - RETURNED RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD- BUTTE CO- NORTH BUTTE CO. COURTHOUSE - 21CV02238

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/6/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT PENG XU'S MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; DEFENDANT LYF...)

7/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT PENG XU'S MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; DEFENDANT LYF...)

Reply - REPLY REPLYMPA

6/25/2021: Reply - REPLY REPLYMPA

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/21/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KIRILL LAVINSKI ISO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

6/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KIRILL LAVINSKI ISO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PENG XU'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

6/21/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PENG XU'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/21/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/14/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/17/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions Against Plaintiff and/or Her Counsel) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketReturned Receipt for Transmitted Record- Butte Co- North Butte Co. Courthouse - 21CV02238; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Kirill Lavinski regarding Transfer Fees); Filed by Deborah Hall-Goodbar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certification of Reproduced Court Documents; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketReceipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (for payment of transfer fees by Plaintiff) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Payment of Transfer Fees by Pl...) of 08/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Payment of Transfer Fees by Pl...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY); Filed by LYFT, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Deborah Hall-Goodbar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by LYFT, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LYFT, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Deborah Hall-Goodbar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Deborah Hall-Goodbar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Deborah Hall-Goodbar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Deborah Hall-Goodbar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAVINSKI KIRILL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLAIR MATTHEW P