This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2023 at 06:09:29 (UTC).

DEBORAH DENISE ALLEN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 DEBORAH DENISE ALLEN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5913

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEN DEBORAH DENISE

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

AVILES GARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COX HEATHER K.

WONG GREGORY PHILIP

Defendant Attorney

FERGUSON NOHEMI GUTIERREZ

 

Court Documents

Answer

6/26/2023: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

6/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

6/6/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

6/6/2023: Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/10/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

5/10/2023: Notice - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

5/10/2023: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/9/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

5/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

5/5/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

Case Management Statement

4/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Continuance

3/28/2023: Notice of Continuance

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/16/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/16/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE ERRATA RE INCORRECT SPELLING OF NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT.

2/22/2023: Notice - NOTICE ERRATA RE INCORRECT SPELLING OF NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/23/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

11/23/2022: Case Management Statement

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2024
  • Hearing06/05/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2024
  • Hearing05/20/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2023
  • Hearing12/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 03/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 07/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: GARY AVILES (Defendant); As to: Deborah Denise Allen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 06/05/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/20/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) and Trial Readiness scheduled for 12/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketTrial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Trial Preparation Order: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DEBORAH DENISE ALLEN, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES a California Public Entity (Defendant); GARY AVILA, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DEBORAH DENISE ALLEN, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES a California Public Entity (Defendant); GARY AVILA, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DEBORAH DENISE ALLEN, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES a California Public Entity (Defendant); GARY AVILA, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Armen Tamzarian in Department 52 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less