This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2021 at 18:44:51 (UTC).

DEBORAH CARR VS M.E.M.L. EDUCATION, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 DEBORAH CARR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against M E M L EDUCATION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1273

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARR DEBORAH

Defendants

LEVI EVAN E.

M.E.M.L. EDUCATION INC. DBA CREATIVE CENTER FOR CHILDREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSHANIAN NEDA

Defendant Attorney

WAINER MAURICE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/27/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

9/3/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • Hearing01/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by M.E.M.L. EDUCATION, INC. (Defendant); EVAN E. LEVI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Deborah Carr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Deborah Carr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Deborah Carr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WAINER MAURICE