Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2021 at 04:56:44 (UTC).

DEBORAH BOVSHOW VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 DEBORAH BOVSHOW filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4922

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOVSHOW DEBORAH

Defendant

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER RICHARD T

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

3/3/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

3/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/23/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/8/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2024
  • Hearing02/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • Hearing08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Hearing07/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (AMENDED); Filed by Deborah Bovshow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Deborah Bovshow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Deborah Bovshow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Deborah Bovshow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Deborah Bovshow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Deborah Bovshow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER RICHARD T