This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2021 at 21:34:09 (UTC).

DEBBRA IDLE ET AL VS HRAYR SHAHINIAN MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 DEBBRA IDLE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HRAYR SHAHINIAN MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2876

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IDLE SCOTT

IDLE DEBBRA

Defendants

SKULL BASE INSTITUTE

SKULL BASE MEDICAL GROUP INC

SHAHINIAN HRAYR M.D.

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

SKULL BASE FOUNDATION

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

BILLING ROSE

Respondent and Defendant

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MULLIGAN JANICE F.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

11/13/2017: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

11/13/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

Notice of Related Cases -

11/13/2017: Notice of Related Cases -

Unknown

7/24/2018: Unknown

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF JOINDER TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATER RELATED ACTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF BRIAN K. FINDLEY

7/24/2018: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF JOINDER TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATER RELATED ACTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF BRIAN K. FINDLEY

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - ENTIRE ACTION, WITH PREJUDICE

4/19/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - ENTIRE ACTION, WITH PREJUDICE

Request for Dismissal

4/3/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/13/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer -

10/11/2018: Answer -

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees -

10/11/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees -

Demand for Jury Trial -

10/11/2018: Demand for Jury Trial -

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Entire Action, with prejudice); Filed by DEBBRA IDLE (Plaintiff); SCOTT IDLE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by DEBBRA IDLE (Plaintiff); SCOTT IDLE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by DEBBRA IDLE (Plaintiff); SCOTT IDLE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by HRAYR, M.D. SHAHINIAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by HRAYR, M.D. SHAHINIAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by HRAYR, M.D. SHAHINIAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF JOINDER TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATER RELATED ACTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF BRIAN K. FINDLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by DEBBRA IDLE (Plaintiff); SCOTT IDLE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DEBBRA IDLE (Plaintiff); SCOTT IDLE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SKULL BASE FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant