This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2021 at 15:13:20 (UTC).

DEBBIE MAY HOLMES VAIL,, ET AL. VS NICOLE ROSE CASTANEDA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2018 DEBBIE MAY HOLMES VAIL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NICOLE ROSE CASTANEDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0146

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOLMES VAIL DEBBIE MAY

VAIL DANIEL

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KEAGAN WENONAH

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

CASTANEDA NICOLE ROSE

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

LUGO KIMBERLY DENISE

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

VAIL EMILIE

VAIL ISAAC

VAIL JACOB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

VANDERPOOL DOUGLAS B.

MAKLEY ROBERT E

SHAVER THOMAS WILLIAM

TALT STEPHEN S

SAHAKIAN CHRISTINE A.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL) OF 04/23/2021

4/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL) OF 04/23/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

4/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Request for Dismissal

4/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/11/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED)]

3/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED)]

Request for Dismissal

3/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

12/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 12/18/2020

12/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 12/18/2020

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED)

11/16/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

7/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

7/29/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 07/29/2020

7/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 07/29/2020

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

8/12/2020: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSIGNED ATTORNEY

5/1/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSIGNED ATTORNEY

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/8/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Publication

3/27/2020: Proof of Publication

Request for Dismissal

2/25/2020: Request for Dismissal

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of 04/23/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kimberly Denise Lugo (Cross-Complainant); The People of the State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transporation Erroneously Sued As State of California (Cross-Complainant); Isaac Vail (Cross-Complainant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Request for Dismissal (not entered)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Emilie Vail (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal ((not entered)); Filed by Debbie May Holmes Vail, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nicole Rose Castaneda (Cross-Defendant); State of California (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Debbie May Holmes Vail, (Plaintiff); Daniel Vail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Debbie May Holmes Vail, (Plaintiff); Daniel Vail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Debbie May Holmes Vail, (Plaintiff); Daniel Vail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Debbie May Holmes Vail, (Plaintiff); Daniel Vail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Debbie May Holmes Vail, (Plaintiff); Daniel Vail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Debbie May Holmes Vail, (Plaintiff); Daniel Vail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Debbie May Holmes Vail, (Plaintiff); Daniel Vail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Isaac Vail (Defendant); Emilie Vail (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Debbie May Holmes Vail, (Plaintiff); Daniel Vail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Debbie May Holmes Vail, (Plaintiff); Daniel Vail (Plaintiff); Isaac Vail (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAKLEY ROBERT E

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANDERPOOL DOUGLAS B.