Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2021 at 02:00:01 (UTC).

DEANNA WILLIAMS VS BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 DEANNA WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4030

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS DEANNA

Defendant

BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEGEREDCHIAN ALEX

Defendant Attorney

HOLM MARGARET M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/7/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION COMPELLING COMPLIANCE

1/11/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION COMPELLING COMPLIANCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

1/14/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Order - ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

1/20/2021: Order - ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

PI General Order

12/11/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

1/16/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/6/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/6/2019: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • Hearing12/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Hearing01/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Hearing01/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Hearing06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS FROM INGLEWOOD INJURY CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketOrder (to Continue Trial); Filed by Behavioral Health Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Trial); Filed by Behavioral Health Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (COMPELLING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS;); Filed by Behavioral Health Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Deanna Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Behavioral Health Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Behavioral Health Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Deanna Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Deanna Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Deanna Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Deanna Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Deanna Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLM MARGARET M