This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 00:05:16 (UTC).

DEANNA R GOOCH VS CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 DEANNA R GOOCH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1169

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOOCH DEANNA R

Defendants

BRIGGS PATRICK

CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ZACHRESON RYAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/1/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR CONVERSION/THEFT

11/1/2022: Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR CONVERSION/THEFT

Proof of Personal Service

12/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • Hearing03/16/2023 at 2:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Deanna R Gooch (Plaintiff); As to: Ryan Zachreson (Defendant); Service Date: 11/7/2022; Service Cost: 110.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Personal Service: Status Date changed from 12/06/2022 to 12/05/2022 ; As To Parties changed from Ryan Zachreson (Defendant) to Ryan Zachreson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint for Conversion/Theft; Filed by: Deanna R Gooch (Plaintiff); As to: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation, a California Corporation (Defendant); Patrick Briggs (Defendant); Ryan Zachreson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Deanna R Gooch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Deanna R Gooch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Deanna R Gooch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/16/2023 at 02:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE LLC is a litigant