This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2022 at 10:15:20 (UTC).

DEANNA PEARSON, ET AL. VS HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 DEANNA PEARSON filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0727

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEARSON DEANNA

PEARSON DOUGLAS

Defendants

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIZIO GREGORY G

Defendant Attorneys

KOSMO FREDERICK WILLIAM

SMITH TED A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/15/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/15/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

8/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/18/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal

8/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Answer

8/18/2022: Answer

Answer

8/12/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Deanna Pearson (Plaintiff); Douglas Pearson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Deanna Pearson (Plaintiff); Douglas Pearson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Deanna Pearson (Plaintiff); Douglas Pearson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Deanna Pearson (Plaintiff); Douglas Pearson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Deanna Pearson (Plaintiff); Douglas Pearson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Deanna Pearson (Plaintiff); Douglas Pearson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIZIO GREGORY G.