This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2022 at 08:06:53 (UTC).

DEANNA MARIE ADAMS VS ISRAEL GUERRERO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 DEANNA MARIE ADAMS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ISRAEL GUERRERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0276

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMS DEANNA MARIE

Defendants

GUERRERO ISRAEL

WASTE MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAKE BENJAMIN

Defendant Attorney

AGHAKHANI BRYAN SHANT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/22/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/26/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/26/2022: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/25/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/27/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Answer

6/23/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/16/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2025
  • Hearing04/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • Hearing06/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • Hearing06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Israel Guerrero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Deanna Marie Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Waste Management of California, Inc Erroneously Sued As Waste Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Waste Management of California, Inc Erroneously Sued As Waste Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Deanna Marie Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Deanna Marie Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Deanna Marie Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Deanna Marie Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Deanna Marie Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WASTE MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHAKHANI BRYAN SHANT