This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 10:12:17 (UTC).

DEANNA ILEJAY CASTRO VS STEPHANIE LYNNE RYE ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by DEANNA ILEJAY CASTRO against STEPHANIE LYNNE RYE in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2384

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CASTRO DEANNA ILEJAY

Respondents and Defendants

ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR COMPANY OF LOS

RYE STEPHANIE LYNNE

NATIONAL CAR RENTAL

DOES 1 TO 50

 

Court Documents

Motion for Leave to Intervene

4/19/2019: Motion for Leave to Intervene

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

5/14/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

Minute Order

6/13/2019: Minute Order

Complaint in Intervention

6/13/2019: Complaint in Intervention

Proof of Service by Mail

6/27/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR, COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/29/2018: ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR, COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

STEPHANIE LYNNE RYE'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT JURY DEMAND REQUESTED

4/16/2018: STEPHANIE LYNNE RYE'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT JURY DEMAND REQUESTED

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

2/1/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/1/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint in Intervention; Filed by LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) (- FSC: 11-19-19 Trial: 12-03-19); Filed by Stephanie Lynne Rye (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR, COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Enterprise Rent A Car Company of Los (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Deanna Ilejay Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Deanna Ilejay Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Deanna Ilejay Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC692384    Hearing Date: February 05, 2020    Dept: 32

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

deanna ilejay castro,

Plaintiff,

v.

stephanie lynne rye, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC692384

Hearing Date: February 5, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

DefendantS’ MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Defendants Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company Los Angeles and Stephanie Lynne Rye (“Defendants”) move to continue the trial date, currently set for February 25, 2020, to June 25, 2020. Defendants seek a trial continuance to permit meaningful mediation. Also, the parties have recently learned that Plaintiff has unanticipated ongoing medical issues, including a potential surgery. The parties wish to postpone mediation until after resolution of these medical issues and discovery on the treatment of those issues. Finally, Plaintiff Deanna Ilejay-Castro has stipulated to the continuance, and has waived any objection to hearing this motion on insufficient notice. Therefore, the motion is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendants’ motion for a continuance is granted. The Court sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: June 10, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: June 25, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be based on the new trial date. There shall be no further continuances of this matter. Defendants shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: February 5, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court