This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/31/2020 at 03:22:55 (UTC).

DEANDREA DAVIS VS WHOLESALE INVESTMENTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 DEANDREA DAVIS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WHOLESALE INVESTMENTS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2891

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS DEANDREA

Defendants

THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA

WHOLESALE INVESTMENTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BARRY CHRISTOPHER P

KAZANDJIAN TSOLIK R.

Defendant Attorney

BRANDT STACIE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/1/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1780(D)

8/31/2020: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1780(D)

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

8/28/2020: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/28/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

10/15/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

10/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/1/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Deandrea Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Deandrea Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Deandrea Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by Deandrea Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketAffidavit (PLAINTIFF?S AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1780(d)); Filed by Deandrea Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Deandrea Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Deandrea Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Deandrea Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Deandrea Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHOLESALE INVESTMENTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Guarantee Company of North America USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRY, CHRISTOPHER P

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAZANDJIAN, TSOLIK R.