This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2023 at 12:25:10 (UTC).

DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC VS RAUL ROBLES

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAUL ROBLES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9248

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC DBA MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Defendant

ROBLES RAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARNER CRAIG B.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG B. GARNER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG B. GARNER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS OF UP TO $500 SHOULD NO...)

1/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS OF UP TO $500 SHOULD NO...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG B. GARNER IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

1/20/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG B. GARNER IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR RAUL

1/17/2023: Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR RAUL

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

1/10/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

Application for Publication

1/10/2023: Application for Publication

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/15/2022

12/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/15/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

11/23/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR RAUL

11/23/2022: Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR RAUL

Application for Publication

11/21/2022: Application for Publication

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/15/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/25/2022

10/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/25/2022

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

6/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Complaint

6/13/2022: Complaint

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • Hearing05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • Hearing05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Publication scheduled for 05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 37

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 37 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 05/08/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Craig B. Garner Re: Case Management Conference: Name Extension changed from OF CRAIG B. GARNER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE to of Craig B. Garner Re: Case Management Conference ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF CRAIG B. GARNER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration in Support of Application for Publication: Name Extension changed from Declaration in Support of Application for Publication to in Support of Application for Publication ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Craig B. Garner in Responses to Order to Show Cause: Name Extension changed from OF CRAIG B. GARNER IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to of Craig B. Garner in Responses to Order to Show Cause ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions of Up to $500 Should No...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketAddress for Craig B. Garner (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Robles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Robles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Robles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gail Killefer in Department 37 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less