This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 10:43:03 (UTC).

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC ET AL VS ARENT FOX LLP ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2017 DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ARENT FOX LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4381

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC DBA MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL FKA SAN FERNANDO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION

DEANCO HEALTHCARE REALTY LLC FKA SAN FERNANDO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ARENT FOX LLP

JEFFRY THOMAS E. JR.

ALBIN-RILEY DEBRA J.

HASKINS STEVEN A.

MAKIN JEFFREY R.

Cross Defendants

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

DEANCO HEALTHCARE REALTY. LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERMAN BRUCE ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

AMBERG JOHN W.

ABELES JERROLD EVAN

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND UNAUTHORIZED SURREPLY BRIEF

2/14/2018: DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND UNAUTHORIZED SURREPLY BRIEF

Minute Order

2/21/2018: Minute Order

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

2/21/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, IN PART

3/1/2018: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, IN PART

Minute Order

3/1/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED MARCH 1,2018

3/8/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED MARCH 1,2018

PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING ON NOTICED MOTION FOR STAY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR TEMPORARY STAY PENDING HEARING ON NOTICED MOTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; D

4/5/2018: PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING ON NOTICED MOTION FOR STAY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR TEMPORARY STAY PENDING HEARING ON NOTICED MOTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; D

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION (ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED)

4/5/2018: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION (ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED)

Minute Order

4/5/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION FOR STAY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER AND STAY OF CASE PENDING REVIEW BY THE COURT OF APPEAL; MEMORANDUM OF POLNTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRUCE SHERMAN; NOTICE OF LODGMENT

4/9/2018: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION FOR STAY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER AND STAY OF CASE PENDING REVIEW BY THE COURT OF APPEAL; MEMORANDUM OF POLNTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRUCE SHERMAN; NOTICE OF LODGMENT

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING ON NOTICED MOTION FOR STAY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER AND; ETC.

4/10/2018: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING ON NOTICED MOTION FOR STAY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER AND; ETC.

Minute Order

4/10/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING ON NOTICED MOTION FOR STAY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CASE AND FOR TEMPORARY STAY PENDING HEARING ON NOTICED MOTION; ETC.

4/10/2018: PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING ON NOTICED MOTION FOR STAY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CASE AND FOR TEMPORARY STAY PENDING HEARING ON NOTICED MOTION; ETC.

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION (1) TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING ON NOTICED MOTION FOR STAY OF MARCH 1, 2018 ORDER AND (2) FOR TEMPORARY STAY; DECLARATION OF JOHN W. AMBERG

4/10/2018: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION (1) TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING ON NOTICED MOTION FOR STAY OF MARCH 1, 2018 ORDER AND (2) FOR TEMPORARY STAY; DECLARATION OF JOHN W. AMBERG

DECLARATION OF STEVEN A. HASKINS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/19/2018: DECLARATION OF STEVEN A. HASKINS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF DEBRA J. ALBIN-RILEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/19/2018: DECLARATION OF DEBRA J. ALBIN-RILEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE

4/19/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR STAY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER PENDING REVIEW BY THE COURT OF APPEAL; SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY L. HAVES

4/23/2018: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR STAY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER PENDING REVIEW BY THE COURT OF APPEAL; SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY L. HAVES

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( to Continue Trial and Trial-Related Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Joint Ex Parte Stipulation and Application to Continue Trial and Trial-Related Dates); Filed by Arent Fox LLP (Defendant); Thomas E. Jeffry, Jr. (Defendant); Debra J. Albin-Riley (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Trial-...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Arent Fox LLP (Defendant); Thomas E. Jeffry, Jr. (Defendant); Debra J. Albin-Riley (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order to Continue Final Status Conference , Trial Date, and Have All Pretrial Deadlines be calculated from the new continued trial date); Filed by Deanco Healthcare LLC (Plaintiff); Deanco Healthcare Realty, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketMinute Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Deanco Healthcare LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Deanco Healthcare LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
232 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR LEGAL MALPRACTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Deanco Healthcare LLC (Plaintiff); Deanco Healthcare Realty, LLC (Plaintiff); San Fernando Community Hospital (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4381    Hearing Date: February 14, 2020    Dept: 74

****4381 DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC ET AL VS ARENT FOX LLP

Defendant’s Motion for Summary Adjudication

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is denied as summary adjudication of the alleged acts of malpractice individually is inappropriate in this case.

“[W]here separate causes of action are commingled into one, court[s] may grant summary adjudication of the individual claims.” (Dominguez v. Washington Mutual Bank (2008) 168 Cal. App. 4th 714, 727; citing Lilienthal & Fowler v. Sup. Ct. (1993) 12 Cal.App.4th 1848, 1854–1855.)

Defendants rely on Lilienthal in this motion, arguing that each act of malpractice is separate and distinct, and should be adjudicated individually.

The court disagrees. Unlike Lilienthal, the acts alleged here did not arise in separate representations of the same client. This case is similar to Crouse v. Brobeck (1998) 67 Cal. App. 4th 1509. That case factually distinguished Lillianthal as involving malpractice claims arising from different services and unrelated transactions, and applied the rule that different acts of negligence contributing to a single injury do not create separate causes of action. (Id. at p. 1526 n.2.) Here, as in Crouse, the acts were all part of a single representation in a single dispute, and the harm alleged is a single injury; that SFCH and plaintiffs were not determined to be the prevailing party and Darbun was awarded it attorney fees and costs.

The motion is denied as the court finds summary adjudication of the individual acts alleged improper.



Case Number: ****4381    Hearing Date: November 18, 2019    Dept: 74

****4381 DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC ET AL VS ARENT FOX LLP ET AL

Defendants’ Motion to Compel Further Responses to Discovery and for Sanctions

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is granted in part. Plaintiffs are ordered to provide further responses, without objections, to request for admissions number 26, 27, 28, 37, 38, 39, 40, 43, 76, 77, 79 and 80 within 15 days. The remainder of the motion is taken off calendar. Sanctions of $2205.65 are awarded against plaintiffs, jointly and severally, payable within 30 days.

Defendants have filed this motion to compel covering nine separate sets of discovery requests. Each set of discovery requests requires its own motion to compel further responses unless the requests and responses at issue are identical. It appears that the first two sets, requests for admissions set 3, have identical requests and responses from Deanco Healthcare and Deanco Realty. The court will consider those requests. The remainder of the motion is taken off calendar. Defendants can recalendar them as individual motions for each set of discovery requests.

Request numbers 26, 27 and 28 are for admissions that plaintiffs did not use their own funds to pay legal fees in the Darbun litigation, but funds from San Fernando Community Hospital. Issues in this action include whether defendants were representing plaintiffs as well as the hospital. The request is reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence. It is no vague as to time, as there is a specific time during which plaintiffs had any involvement or paid any legal fees. It is not burdensome or oppressive. Further response is ordered.

Request numbers 37, 38, 39, 40 and 43 seek admissions of the good quality of specific actions taken in the Darbun litigation. The standard of defendants’ services in the Darbun action is relevant, even if the subject of the request is not an action for which malpractice is claimed. The requests are not vague, ambiguous or compound. Further response is ordered.

Request numbers 76, 77, 79 and 80 seek admission as to the malpractice claim, its accrual and standing to pursue the claim. The set of requests was properly accompanied by the declaration of the necessity for exceeding the statutory number of requests. Timeliness and standing are issues relevant to the malpractice action. Further response is ordered.

Sanctions

Defendants are entitled to sanctions. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subd. (c).) Sanctions of $2205.65 are awarded.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEANCO HEALTHCARE REALTY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ARENT FOX LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC A CALIFORNIA... is a litigant