This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 07:56:54 (UTC).

DEAN R. ISAACSON VS 1022 S. LA CIENEGA MANAGER, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 DEAN R ISAACSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 1022 S LA CIENEGA MANAGER, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6896

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISAACSON DEAN R.

Defendants

1022 S. LA CIENEGA MANAGER LLC

ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA LLC

ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA V LLC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

2/25/2022: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/23/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

2/23/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

4/8/2022: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • Hearing10/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by Assisted Living America V, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dean R. Isaacson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dean R. Isaacson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dean R. Isaacson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less