This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 20:37:07 (UTC).

DEAN R ISAACSON, AS A MEMBER OF ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA V, LLC VS 1022 S LA CIENEGA MANAGER, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 DEAN R ISAACSON, AS A MEMBER OF ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA V, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 1022 S LA CIENEGA MANAGER, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6684

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISAACSON DEAN R.

Defendants

1022 S LA CIENEGA MANAGER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA LLC A DELAWARE LIIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA V LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BENDER RON

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/23/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (BANKRUPTCY) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING AND IMPOSITION OF AUTOMATIC STAY PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 362(A)

3/4/2022: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (BANKRUPTCY) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING AND IMPOSITION OF AUTOMATIC STAY PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 362(A)

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/24/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/24/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

2/23/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/05/2022

4/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/05/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • Hearing08/23/2022 at 10:15 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Docketat 09:45 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Docketat 09:58 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/05/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) (NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING AND IMPOSITION OF AUTOMATIC STAY PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 362(a)); Filed by Assisted Living America V LLC A California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dean R. Isaacson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dean R. Isaacson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1022 S. LA CIENEGA MANAGER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENDER RON ESQ.