This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 01:53:34 (UTC).

DEAN HIMBLER AVILES VS CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 DEAN HIMBLER AVILES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9276

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVILES DEAN HIMBLER

Defendants

CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL

CITY OF RANCHO CUCAMONGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HELFAT DANIEL LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Request - PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR MEDICAL RECORDS

9/7/2021: Request - PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR MEDICAL RECORDS

Request - PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR MEDICAL RECORDS

9/7/2021: Request - PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR MEDICAL RECORDS

Other - - U.S.P.S CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/24/2021: Other - - U.S.P.S CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

9/24/2021: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/30/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

10/7/2021: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

PI General Order

8/30/2021: PI General Order

Other - - MEDICAL RECORDS REQUEST

8/20/2021: Other - - MEDICAL RECORDS REQUEST

Other - - MEDICAL RECORDS REQUEST

8/20/2021: Other - - MEDICAL RECORDS REQUEST

Other - - MEDICAL RECORDS REQUEST

8/20/2021: Other - - MEDICAL RECORDS REQUEST

Other - - CIVIL SUBPOENA

8/13/2021: Other - - CIVIL SUBPOENA

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/9/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

8/9/2021: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2024
  • Hearing08/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • Hearing02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • Hearing01/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Hearing03/09/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons (SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE WITH ATTACHED EXHIBIT ?A?); Filed by California Highway Patrol (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Dean Himbler Aviles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Dean Himbler Aviles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Dean Himbler Aviles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Dean Himbler Aviles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMedical Records Request; Filed by Dean Himbler Aviles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMedical Records Request; Filed by Dean Himbler Aviles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMedical Records Request; Filed by Dean Himbler Aviles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Subpoena; Filed by Dean Himbler Aviles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dean Himbler Aviles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dean Himbler Aviles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Rancho Cucamonga is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL is a litigant