Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2021 at 13:51:51 (UTC).

DEAN E. SMART VS EDWARD O. LEAR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 DEAN E SMART filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against EDWARD O LEAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MONICA BACHNER and DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7665

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MONICA BACHNER

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMART DEAN E.

Defendants

LEAR EDWARD O.

CENTURY LAW GROUP LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EDWARD O. LEAR AND CENTURY LAW GROUP, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

3/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EDWARD O. LEAR AND CENTURY LAW GROUP, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

3/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

Motion to Compel Arbitration

1/14/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Case Management Statement

1/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/19/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR EDWARD

8/7/2020: Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR EDWARD

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

5/13/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Mail

5/13/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

5/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;) OF 05/18/2020

5/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;) OF 05/18/2020

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/8/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/11/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • Hearing03/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Dean E. Smart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EDWARD O. LEAR AND CENTURY LAW GROUP, LLC?S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OF PROCEEDINGS); Filed by Dean E. Smart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Century Law Group, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by Edward O. Lear (Defendant); Century Law Group, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docketat 10:57 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: peremptory challenge to judicial officer;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: peremptory challenge to judicial officer;) of 05/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Dean E. Smart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Dean E. Smart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dean E. Smart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dean E. Smart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTURY LAW GROUP LLP is a litigant