This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 04:53:33 (UTC).

DEACERO U.S.A. INC. VS ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 DEACERO U S A INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ACME METALS STEEL SUPPLY INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1361

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEACERO U.S.A. INC.

Defendants

ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY INC. A CORPORATION

GOLDBERG JACK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOOSKA STEVEN A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/6/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

11/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • Hearing02/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DEACERO U.S.A. INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DEACERO U.S.A. INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DEACERO U.S.A. INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DEACERO U.S.A. INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DEACERO U.S.A. INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEACERO USA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven A Booska