This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 01:13:58 (UTC).

DE WELL GROUP LLC ET AL VS JOSE VERDUZCO GUERRA ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 DE WELL GROUP LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against JOSE VERDUZCO GUERRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0051

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DE WELL GROUP LLC

DE WELL LOGISTICS LLC

Respondents and Defendants

GUERRA JOSE VERDUZCO

GARCIA EDUARDO

CARTAGENA ROGER

VALADEZ MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SABNIS CHERYL A.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHARGING LIEN FOR SERVICES RENDERED

2/6/2018: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHARGING LIEN FOR SERVICES RENDERED

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHARGING LIEN FOR SERVICES RENDERED

2/6/2018: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHARGING LIEN FOR SERVICES RENDERED

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHARGING LIEN FOR SERVICES RENDERED

2/6/2018: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHARGING LIEN FOR SERVICES RENDERED

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHARGING LIEN FOR SERVICES RENDERED

2/6/2018: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHARGING LIEN FOR SERVICES RENDERED

Notice

2/22/2019: Notice

DECLARATION OF CHERYL A. SABNIS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF CONTROVERSIES AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS

6/27/2017: DECLARATION OF CHERYL A. SABNIS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF CONTROVERSIES AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS

SUMMONS

6/27/2017: SUMMONS

PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF CONTROVERSIES; ETC

6/27/2017: PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF CONTROVERSIES; ETC

DECLARATION OF SK CHOI IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF CONTROVERSIES AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS

6/27/2017: DECLARATION OF SK CHOI IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF CONTROVERSIES AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS

MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

6/28/2017: MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF HEARINGS ON (1) MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS, AND (2) PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF CONTROVERSIES

6/28/2017: NOTICE OF HEARINGS ON (1) MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS, AND (2) PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF CONTROVERSIES

PROOF OF SERVICE

6/28/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/10/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/10/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PETITIONERS' NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON RESPONDENTS' LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS; ETC.

7/11/2017: PETITIONERS' NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON RESPONDENTS' LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS; ETC.

ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON RESPONDENTS' LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS

7/11/2017: ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON RESPONDENTS' LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

7/11/2017: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

Proof of Service

7/11/2017: Proof of Service

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • Notice ( of Release of Lien Claims); Filed by De Well Group LLC (Plaintiff); De Well Logistics LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHARGING LIEN FOR SERVICES RENDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHARGING LIEN FOR SERVICES RENDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHARGING LIEN FOR SERVICES RENDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHARGING LIEN FOR SERVICES RENDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Eduardo Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Eduardo Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Eduardo Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by De Well Group LLC (Plaintiff); De Well Logistics LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by De Well Group LLC (Plaintiff); De Well Logistics LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARINGS ON (1) MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS, AND (2) PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF CONTROVERSIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF CONTROVERSIES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF CHERYL A. SABNIS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF CONTROVERSIES AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF SK CHOI IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF CONTROVERSIES AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON LABOR COMMISSIONER COMPLAINTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DE WELL GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DE WELL LOGISTICS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SABNIS CHERYL A