Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 03:39:26 (UTC).

DE LOS SANTOS RIVERA, DELIA VS LOPEZ CAYETANO, JOSE LUIS

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 DE LOS SANTOS RIVERA, DELIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LOPEZ CAYETANO, JOSE LUIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8573

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DE LOS SANTOS RIVERA DELIA

Respondent

LOPEZ CAYETANO JOSE LUIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Notice - Rejection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Default (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 2A, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Summons (on 1st amended petition ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Petition - Amended (1st) (as to separate prop: from 9a to 9b - confirm separate prop in FL-160 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Declaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less