This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 11:20:41 (UTC).

DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC VS SOL GRAPHIX, INC,E

Case Summary

On 02/17/2017 DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit against SOL GRAPHIX, INC,E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH A. ROGERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2967

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH A. ROGERS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

Respondents

PRINTER SOLUTIONS INC

CHAPLEAU CHRISTOPHER

SOL GRAPHIX INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COX PAMELA L.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

2/17/2017: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

2/17/2017: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

JUDGMENT BASSED ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

2/17/2017: JUDGMENT BASSED ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION

3/3/2017: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/13/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/13/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/13/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ABSTRACT OF JUDGEMENT

4/25/2017: ABSTRACT OF JUDGEMENT

WRIT OF EXECUTION

8/28/2017: WRIT OF EXECUTION

APPL. & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAM. (ATT.-ENF OF JUDGEMENT)

10/20/2017: APPL. & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAM. (ATT.-ENF OF JUDGEMENT)

APPL. & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAM. (ATT.-ENF OF JUDGEMENT)

10/20/2017: APPL. & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAM. (ATT.-ENF OF JUDGEMENT)

APPL. & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAM. (ATT.-ENF OF JUDGEMENT)

10/20/2017: APPL. & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAM. (ATT.-ENF OF JUDGEMENT)

Proof of Service

11/13/2017: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

11/13/2017: Proof of Service

Minute Order

12/19/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/23/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/21/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

1/30/2019: Unknown

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • Attachment (Return on Attachment/Execution)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Writ issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A15; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrg; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-03-21 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A15; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrg; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Sister State Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where De Lage Landen Financial Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COX PAMELA