This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 04:58:05 (UTC).

DE JESUS, MARIA VICTORIA VS MELERO, OMAR JOSE

Case Summary

On 01/20/2017 DE JESUS, MARIA VICTORIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MELERO, OMAR JOSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4339

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DE JESUS MARIA VICTORIA

Respondent

MELERO OMAR JOSE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • Mail - Returned Mail (DEFAULT )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (FILED AND ENTERED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Submitted for signature F50 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2017
  • Application - Publication/Posting of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F39, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Held - FCCR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Order - Publication (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: De Jesus, Maria - Denied on 2017-05-17 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Application - Publication/Posting of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: De Jesus, Maria - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-28 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: De Jesus, Maria ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: De Jesus, Maria ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: De Jesus, Maria ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.