This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2021 at 22:26:32 (UTC).

DC TRAFFIC CONTROL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS GW CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 DC TRAFFIC CONTROL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GW CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4398

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DC TRAFFIC CONTROL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

GUENO ANDRE JEROME

GW CIVIL CONTRACTORS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STADCO LA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TURNER AECOM-HUNT NFL JV AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

WELDON RICHARD

GW CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ECOFF LAWRENCE C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/8/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/7/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

9/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

9/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

10/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • Hearing12/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Hearing11/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by DC Traffic Control, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by DC Traffic Control, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DC Traffic Control, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by DC Traffic Control, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DC Traffic Control, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DC Traffic Control, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DC Traffic Control, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STADCO LA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ECOFF BLUT, LLP - LAWRENCE C. ECOFF