This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2022 at 14:46:51 (UTC).

DB INSURANCE CO., LTD. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 DB INSURANCE CO , LTD filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9775

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DB INSURANCE CO. LTD.

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARKER JAY D.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/13/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/13/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/13/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

9/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/13/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/21/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 09/27/2022

9/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 09/27/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 09/28/2022

9/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 09/28/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

9/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

9/30/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

10/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE;)

11/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE;)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2023
  • Hearing10/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • Hearing01/09/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 01/09/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 11/01/2022 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14 updated: Result Date to 11/01/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketNotice Notice Of Remote Appearance; Filed by: DB Insurance Co., LTD. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice Of Court Order Re Complex Determination; Filed by: DB Insurance Co., LTD. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 11/01/2022 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 20STCV39273, 22STCV29775 are related; case number 20STCV39273 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: DB Insurance Co., LTD. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/21/2022; Service Cost: 138.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DB Insurance Co., LTD. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DB Insurance Co., LTD. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DB Insurance Co., LTD. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: DB Insurance Co., LTD. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dongbu Insurance Company, Limited (U.S. Branch) is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARKER JAY DOUGLAS