This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 00:44:47 (UTC).

DAYNA HAWES VS KHALED HAFAIEDH ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/02/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by DAYNA HAWES against KHALED HAFAIEDH in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8889

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

HAWES DAYNA

Defendants and Respondents

TOP LA SEDAN LLC

HAFAIEDH KHALED

MARTENSEN ROBERT

DOES 1-100

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/18/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/21/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Notice of Change of Firm Name

12/24/2018: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Settlement

3/14/2019: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/14/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Request for Dismissal

4/8/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

4/22/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/1/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

3/7/2018: NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

Summons on Cross Complaint

3/7/2018: Summons on Cross Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/7/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY; DECLARATORY RELIEF AND APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

3/7/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY; DECLARATORY RELIEF AND APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/7/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/7/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/21/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

4/2/2018: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

4/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

1/2/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Khaled Hafaiedh (Defendant); Top La Sedan LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Khaled Hafaiedh (Defendant); Top La Sedan LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Dayna Hawes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Khaled Hafaiedh (Defendant); Top La Sedan LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Robert Martensen (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Robert Martensen (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Robert Martensen (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Robert Martensen (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Robert Martensen (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Robert Martensen (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Dayna Hawes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Dayna Hawes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

POS-010

APR 05 2018

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES LG sTReeT aporess: 111 NORTH HILL STREET g d arten nxecuqye oy, Cierk of . e Y. 2% of Cour, MAILING ADDRESS: . < D oiTy anp 2P cope: LOS ANGELES, CA 90012 Todi Lars » Ueputy

BRANCH NaME: CENTRAL DISTRICT PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER: DAYNA HAWES DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT: KHALED HAFAIEDH, AN INDIVIDUAL; et al.

~® Q0T

b. [] Person {other than the party in item 3a) served on behalf of an entity or as an authorized agent (and not a person under item 5b on whom substituted service was made) (specify name and relationship to the party named in item 3a):

. Address where the party was served: 3145 SOUTH CANFIELD AVENUE, #5 LOS ANGELES, CA 90034

5. | served the party (check proper box) a. by personal service, | personally delivered the documents listed in item 2 to the party or person authorized to receive service of process for the party (1) on (date): 03/29/2018 (2) at (time): 08:30 am

b. [] by substituted service. On (date): at (time): | left the documents listed in item 2 with or in the presence of (name and title or relationship to person indicated in item 3b):

(1) [J (business) a person at least 18 years of age apparently in charge at the office or usual place of business of the person to be served. | informedgeneral nature of the papers.

;]5 (2) D (home) a competent member of the household (at least 18 years of age) at the dwelling house or usual place of Yo abode of the party. | informedgeneral nature of the papers. Ci

& (3) L] (physical address unknown) a person at least 18 years of age apparently in charge at the usual mailing ' address of the person to be served, other than a United States Postal Service post office box. 1 informed him of E & her of the general nature of the papers.

i (4) [] 1thereafter mailed (by first-class, postage prepaid) copies of the documents to the person to be served at the @: place where the copies were left (Code Civ. Proc., §415.20). | mailed the documents on

G (date): from (city): or [] a declaration-of mailing is attached.

>t (5) [] 1attach.a declaration of diligence stating actions taken first to attempt personal service.

Page10i2 Form Approved for Mandatory Use Code of Civil Procedure, § 417,10