This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2023 at 01:23:07 (UTC).

DAYMEL PENALOZA, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE, ET AL. VS OSCAR MOLINA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 DAYMEL PENALOZA, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OSCAR MOLINA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is OLIVIA ROSALES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1245

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

OLIVIA ROSALES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAYMEL PENALOZA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE

ESTATE OF EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CALTRANS

MOLINA ISABEL

MOLINA JAVIER

MOLINA OSCAR

THE CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS

THE CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS

THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

CARRILLO ISABEL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

THE CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEECHER BRIAN G.

Defendant Attorneys

CASE ANTHONY THOMAS

STOCKALPER PATRICK E.

ZEGEL JOHN E.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FERRANTE-ALAN DAVID M.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

5/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/12/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/10/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/11/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Association of Attorney

4/6/2023: Association of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/29/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer - ANSWER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/28/2023: Answer - ANSWER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/28/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/14/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

3/13/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/13/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT

2/28/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/28/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

2/16/2023: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

2/3/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Answer

2/3/2023: Answer

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA; THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION; CALTRANS, FROM COMPLAINT FILED BY DAYMEL PENALOZA,

1/30/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA; THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION; CALTRANS, FROM COMPLAINT FILED BY DAYMEL PENALOZA,

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: OSCAR MOLINA (Defendant); JAVIER MOLINA (Defendant); ISABEL MOLINA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: THE CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: DAYMEL PENALOZA, individually and as Successor In Interest to EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: THE CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: OSCAR MOLINA (Defendant); JAVIER MOLINA (Defendant); ISABEL MOLINA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Continued Case Management Conference; Filed by: DAYMEL PENALOZA, individually and as Successor In Interest to EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE (Plaintiff); As to: OSCAR MOLINA (Defendant); THE CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: OSCAR MOLINA (Cross-Defendant); Javier Molina (Cross-Defendant); Isabel Carrillo (Cross-Defendant); As to: THE CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer to Amended Cross-Complaint: Name Extension: to Amended Cross-Complaint ; As To Parties changed from THE CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS (Cross-Complainant) to THE CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DAYMEL PENALOZA, individually and as Successor In Interest to EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE (Plaintiff); As to: THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); Service Date: 11/18/2022; Service Cost: 112.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DAYMEL PENALOZA, individually and as Successor In Interest to EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE (Plaintiff); As to: THE CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS (Defendant); Service Date: 11/21/2022; Service Cost: 112.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DAYMEL PENALOZA, individually and as Successor In Interest to EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE (Plaintiff); As to: THE CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS (Defendant); Service Date: 11/21/2022; Service Cost: 112.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DAYMEL PENALOZA, individually and as Successor In Interest to EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE (Plaintiff); As to: OSCAR MOLINA (Defendant); JAVIER MOLINA (Defendant); ISABEL MOLINA (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DAYMEL PENALOZA, individually and as Successor In Interest to EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE (Plaintiff); As to: OSCAR MOLINA (Defendant); JAVIER MOLINA (Defendant); ISABEL MOLINA (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DAYMEL PENALOZA, individually and as Successor In Interest to EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF EDMAR RONALDO ANDRADE (Plaintiff); As to: OSCAR MOLINA (Defendant); JAVIER MOLINA (Defendant); ISABEL MOLINA (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less