This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/26/2023 at 05:54:21 (UTC).

DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS ASSIGNEE FOR MICHAEL J. MONA JR. VS ISAAC NORMAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS ASSIGNEE FOR MICHAEL J MONA JR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ISAAC NORMAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHANIE M. BOWICK, RICHARD L. FRUIN and BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1782

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

RICHARD L. FRUIN

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION

Defendant

NORMAN ISAAC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEGITTINO TRICIA L. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

GOLD GEOFFREY M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/29/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/17/2022

8/17/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/17/2022

Notice of Settlement

8/15/2022: Notice of Settlement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/3/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2022

5/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

5/23/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Answer

5/23/2022: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/19/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

4/13/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

4/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

4/12/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/6/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION, a California corporation as assignee for Michael J. Mona Jr. on 04/06/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Dayco Funding Corporation as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Dayco Funding Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Dayco Funding Corporation (Plaintiff); Isaac Norman (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/17/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Dayco Funding Corporation (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Dayco Funding Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Dayco Funding Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara M. Scheper in Department 30 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Tricia L Legittino, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION, a California corporation as assignee for Michael J. Mona Jr. to DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- ISAAC NORMAN (Defendant): Last Name changed from NORMAN, an individual to NORMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION, a California corporation as assignee for Michael J. Mona Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: ISAAC NORMAN, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION, a California corporation as assignee for Michael J. Mona Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: ISAAC NORMAN, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION, a California corporation as assignee for Michael J. Mona Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: ISAAC NORMAN, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION, a California corporation as assignee for Michael J. Mona Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: ISAAC NORMAN, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less